There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Civics Learning Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to increase civics education programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/29/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/29/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E105)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (78)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/11/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/11/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 02/11/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/11/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/11/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/11/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/11/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/11/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/06/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/06/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 03/06/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 03/06/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 03/06/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/06/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 03/06/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/06/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/07/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/27/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/27/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/03/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 04/30/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/30/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 04/30/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/30/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/08/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/15/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 05/16/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 05/17/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 06/13/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/27/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/27/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/11/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 07/11/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/16/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 07/16/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/16/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 07/16/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/17/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/17/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 07/24/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/24/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/24/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/24/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/06/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/06/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/24/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/24/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/24/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/24/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/28/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/28/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 10/28/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/31/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 10/31/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 12/05/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/05/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 12/05/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 06/15/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor01/29/2019 Referred to

As of 08/09/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.849 - Civics Learning Act of 2019


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.849. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/2019)

Civics Learning Act of 2019

This bill amends the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to prioritize innovative civics learning and teaching and to provide additional funding in FY2020 for civics education programs.

The bill expands the allowable uses of grant funds for civics education to include before, during, and after-school and extracurricular activities, activities that include service learning and community service projects that are linked to school curriculum, activities that encourage and support student participation in school governance, and online and video game-based learning.

The Department of Education must ensure that specified percentages of grant funds for civics education be awarded on a diverse basis to eligible entities that serve students and teachers at elementary schools, middle schools, and high schools.