There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Agency Accountability Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the appropriation of funds to use a fee, fine, penalty, or proceeds from a settlement received by a Federal agency, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/29/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
03/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/29/2019Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2019Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2019Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2019Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (84)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 01/29/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10]* 01/29/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 01/29/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/29/2019
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Rose, John W. [R-TN-6]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 01/30/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/30/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 01/30/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 01/30/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 01/30/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 02/05/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/05/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 02/06/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 02/06/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 02/06/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 02/06/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/07/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 02/07/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 02/08/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 02/11/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/13/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 02/14/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 03/05/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 03/21/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 05/10/2019

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform01/29/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary01/29/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law03/25/2019 Referred to
House Budget01/29/2019 Referred to
House Rules01/29/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.850. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/2019)

Agency Accountability Act of 2019

This bill requires any agency that receives a fee, fine, penalty, or proceeds from a settlement to deposit the amount in the general fund of the Treasury. The bill also prohibits the funds from being used unless the funding is provided in advance in an appropriations bill.

The bill includes exceptions for funds to be paid to a whistle-blower, loan guarantee programs, and insurance programs.

The requirements do not apply to the U.S. Postal Service or the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO). The Department of Commerce and the USPTO must report annually to Congress on funds collected by the USPTO from a settlement.

The bill also requires offsetting receipts and collections to be treated as revenue for the purpose of carrying out the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 and other laws. (Offsetting receipts and collections are funds collected by agencies from other government accounts or from the public in businesslike or market-oriented transactions. Under current law, the collections are treated as negative budget authority and outlays rather than revenue and may be used to offset spending for budget enforcement purposes.)