There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Get the Lead Out of Schools Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Safe Drinking Water Act to address lead contamination in school drinking water.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/29/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/29/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 01/29/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/29/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/05/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/05/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/05/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 02/05/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/05/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/05/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 02/05/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 02/05/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/05/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 02/14/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/14/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/18/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/26/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/25/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/06/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 09/06/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 12/03/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 12/11/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 02/26/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/17/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/29/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.852.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.852. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/2019)

Get the Lead Out of Schools Act

This bill requires the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to (1) test for lead in drinking water at schools and day care facilities, and (2) create a grant program for lead testing and remediation efforts in schools and day care facilities.

Specifically, the EPA must promulgate a national primary drinking water regulation for schools and day care facilities that

  • establishes a lead action level (a level of lead in drinking water that triggers additional actions to control lead contamination) that is no more than 15 parts per billion;
  • directs each public water system to sample for lead in the drinking water at schools and day care facilities if the EPA determines there is a risk that the lead in the drinking water will meet or exceed the action level; and
  • requires public water systems that serve schools or day cares that meet or exceed the action level to notify the local educational agency, the relevant local health agencies, the municipality, and the state as soon as practicable, but no later than 24 hours after the system receives the sampling results.

The EPA must also establish a grant program for (1) testing drinking water in schools and day care facilities for lead contamination, and (2) remediating lead contamination in such drinking water by replacing lead pipes and certain plumbing materials with lead-free material.