There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Humanitarian Assistance to the Venezuelan People Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide humanitarian assistance to the Venezuelan people, including Venezuelan migrants and refugees in the Americas and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/25/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2769-2770)
01/29/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
03/26/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
03/25/2019-5:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/25/2019-5:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2769-2770)
03/25/2019-4:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 854.
03/25/2019-4:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2769-2771)
03/25/2019-4:56pmHouseMr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/14/2019HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
03/14/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
03/14/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/29/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/29/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/29/2019 Referred to
03/14/2019 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations03/26/2019 Referred to

As of 06/24/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.854 - Humanitarian Assistance to the Venezuelan People Act of 2019.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.