There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To nullify the effect of Executive Order 13950 relating to combating race and sex stereotyping.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/16/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
10/16/2020Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/16/2020Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/16/2020Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/16/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 10/16/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/20/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/20/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/20/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 10/23/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/23/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 10/27/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/27/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/30/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/30/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/30/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 10/30/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 10/30/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/30/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/30/2020
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/30/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 10/30/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/30/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/30/2020
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 10/30/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/30/2020
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 10/30/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/30/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 10/30/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/30/2020
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 10/30/2020
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/30/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/30/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/05/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 11/09/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 11/09/2020

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform10/16/2020 Referred to
House Education and Labor10/16/2020 Referred to
House Armed Services10/16/2020 Referred to

As of 12/01/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.8595 - To nullify the effect of Executive Order 13950 relating to combating race and sex stereotyping.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.