There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Ocean-Based Climate Solutions Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Commerce, acting through the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, to provide for ocean-based climate solutions to reduce carbon emissions and global warming; to make coastal communities more resilient; and to provide for the conservation and restoration of ocean and coastal habitats, biodiversity, and marine mammal and fish populations; and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/20/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
11/17/2020Committee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/21/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
10/21/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
10/20/2020Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, House Administration, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/20/2020Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, House Administration, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/20/2020Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, House Administration, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/20/2020Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, House Administration, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/20/2020Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, House Administration, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/20/2020Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, House Administration, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/20/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 10/20/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/20/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 10/20/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 10/20/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 10/20/2020
Del. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 10/20/2020
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 10/20/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 10/20/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 10/20/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 10/20/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 10/20/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 10/20/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/20/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/23/2020
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 10/23/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/23/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 10/23/2020
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/27/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/27/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/27/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/30/2020
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 10/30/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/30/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/30/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/05/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 11/05/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/05/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 11/09/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/16/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/16/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 11/16/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/18/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/18/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/20/2020
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/20/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/30/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 11/30/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/03/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 12/18/2020

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources10/20/2020 Referred to
11/17/2020 Hearings by
House Science, Space, and Technology10/20/2020 Referred to
Committee on House Administration10/20/2020 Referred to
House Ways and Means10/20/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure10/20/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment10/21/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation10/21/2020 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs10/20/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

With the start of a new Congress, summaries from prior Congresses may be delayed or abbreviated.