There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Fairness For Breastfeeding Mothers Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Fairness For Breastfeeding Mothers Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Fairness For Breastfeeding Mothers Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide a lactation room in public buildings.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
07/15/2019Presented to President.
06/26/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
06/26/2019Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4585)
02/06/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1371)
01/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
07/15/2019HousePresented to President.
06/27/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/26/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
06/26/2019SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4585)
02/07/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
02/06/2019-12:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/06/2019-12:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1371)
02/06/2019-12:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 866.
02/06/2019-12:26pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1371-1372)
02/06/2019-12:25pmHouseMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/30/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
01/30/2019HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E111)
01/30/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/04/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 02/04/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 02/05/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 02/06/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/30/2019 Referred to
Senate Environment and Public Works02/07/2019 Referred to
06/26/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.866. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (06/26/2019)

Fairness For Breastfeeding Mothers Act of 2019

(Sec. 2) This bill requires that certain public buildings that are open to the public and contain a public restroom provide a lactation room, other than a bathroom, that is hygienic and is available for use by members of the public to express milk. The lactation room must be shielded from public view, be free from intrusion, and contain a chair, a working surface, and (if the building is supplied with electricity) an electrical outlet.

A public building may be excluded from such requirement at the discretion of the official responsible for its operation if

  • it does not contain a lactation room for employees and does not have a space that could be repurposed as one or that could be made private by using portable materials, at a reasonable cost; or
  • the cost of new construction required to create a lactation room is not feasible.