There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Bears Ears Expansion And Respect for Sovereignty Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expand the boundaries of the Bears Ears National Monument, to ensure prompt engagement with the Bears Ears Commission and prompt implementation of the Proclamation establishing the Bears Ears National Monument, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
02/13/2019Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/13/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/30/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/30/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (132)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/30/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/30/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 01/30/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/30/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/30/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 01/30/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/30/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/25/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 02/25/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/25/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/25/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 02/25/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/25/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/25/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/25/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/25/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 02/25/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/25/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/25/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/25/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/25/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 02/25/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/25/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/25/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 02/25/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 02/25/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/13/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/13/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/13/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 03/13/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 03/29/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 03/29/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/10/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 05/10/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 06/10/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/10/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/30/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/30/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/30/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 08/06/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/06/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 08/06/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 08/06/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 08/06/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 08/16/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 08/16/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/09/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 09/16/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/17/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/24/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 09/24/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 09/24/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/26/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/26/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 09/27/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 10/04/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 10/08/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 10/17/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 10/21/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/27/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources01/30/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands02/13/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States02/13/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.871.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.871. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/30/2019)

Bears Ears Expansion And Respect for Sovereignty Act

This bill expands the boundaries of the Bears Ears National Monument in Utah.

The Department of the Interior and the Department of Agriculture (USDA) shall administer the lands under their jurisdictions within the expanded boundaries (1) as part of the monument; and (2) in accordance with Presidential Proclamation 9558, dated December 28, 2016, that provided for the establishment of the monument.

Interior and USDA shall promptly carry out the proclamation's provisions, including the provisions requiring them to engage the Bears Ears Commission to

  • ensure the proper care and management of the objects identified,
  • ensure that management decisions affecting the monument reflect tribal expertise and traditional and historical knowledge, and
  • provide guidance and recommendations on the development and implementation of management plans and on management of the monument.

The National Park Service shall administer the Natural Bridges National Monument and those portions of Glen Canyon National Recreation Area that are within the expanded boundaries of the monument.

Interior and USDA may acquire any land, water, or interests in land that are located within the revised boundaries of the monument by donation, purchase, or exchange.