There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Transformation to Competitive Employment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To assist employers providing employment under special certificates issued under section 14(c) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to transform their business and program models, to support individuals with disabilities to transition to competitive integrated employment, to phase out the use of such special certificates, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/30/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/30/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5]* 01/30/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/07/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 02/11/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/14/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 02/14/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/14/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 02/14/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 02/22/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 02/22/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/22/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/27/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/06/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 03/06/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/12/2019
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/14/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 03/14/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 03/14/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/21/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/27/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/27/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 04/03/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/12/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/29/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/01/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/03/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 05/03/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/03/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/10/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/14/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 05/14/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/14/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 05/14/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/15/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 05/15/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/15/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/21/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 05/21/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 05/21/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 05/23/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 06/04/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/04/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/06/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/10/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/10/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/10/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 06/26/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/28/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 07/09/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/25/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/09/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 10/15/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 11/22/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/03/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/16/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/21/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 02/25/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 03/04/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 05/22/2020
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 08/25/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 10/20/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor01/30/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.873. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/30/2019)

Transformation to Competitive Employment Act

This bill addresses employment standards for individuals with disabilities.

The bill directs the Department of Labor to award grants to states and certain eligible entities to assist them in transforming their business and program models to support individuals with disabilities by

  • operating competitive integrated employment businesses,
  • assisting disabled individuals in finding and retaining work in such employment, and
  • providing integrated employment and integrated community participation and wraparound services for such individuals.

The bill prohibits the issuance of new special certificates that allow payment of subminimum wages to disabled individuals and phases out existing certificates over a six year period.

The bill directs the Office of Disability Employment of Labor to award grants to provide technical assistance to employers transitioning from special certificates to competitive integrated employment for disabled individuals.

Labor must contract with a nonprofit entity to conduct an evaluation of the impact of the transitioning requirements of this bill.