There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Keeping All Students Safe Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit and prevent seclusion, mechanical restraint, chemical restraint, and dangerous restraints that restrict breathing, and to prevent and reduce the use of physical restraint in schools, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/19/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
11/19/2020Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2020Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/19/2020
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 11/19/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/19/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/19/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/19/2020
Del. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/19/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/24/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 11/24/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/24/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/24/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/24/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/24/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 11/24/2020
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 11/24/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/24/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 11/24/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/15/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 12/15/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/15/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/15/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/15/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/15/2020
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/15/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 12/15/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 12/16/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/16/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/17/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 12/18/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 12/18/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 12/18/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 12/21/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor11/19/2020 Referred to
House Armed Services11/19/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.8782. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/19/2020)

Keeping All Students Safe Act

This bill prohibits the use of seclusion and limits the use of physical restraint in schools and Head Start programs that receive federal funding. It also establishes enforcement provisions, including a private right of action for a student who has been subjected to unlawful seclusion or restraint, and creates a grant program for state educational agencies to implement the procedures required by the bill.