There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Tennessee Valley Authority Transparency Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require certain meetings of the Tennessee Valley Authority to be transparent and open to the public, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/07/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/30/2019Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/30/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/11/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/13/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/30/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment02/07/2019 Referred to

As of 08/05/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.881 - Tennessee Valley Authority Transparency Act of 2019


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.881. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/30/2019)

Tennessee Valley Authority Transparency Act of 2019

This bill revises the duties of the Tennessee Valley Authority Board of Directors to include holding public meetings.

The board must provide public notice at least six days before such a meeting, unless the meeting is designated as an emergency.