There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Esther Martinez Native American Languages Programs Reauthorization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Native American Programs Act of 1974 to provide flexibility and reauthorization to ensure the survival and continuing vitality of Native American languages.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/30/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/30/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/30/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 01/30/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/30/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2]* 01/30/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/27/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/29/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/10/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/10/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/10/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/10/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/10/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/30/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 07/30/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 07/30/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/30/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 08/27/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 08/27/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/27/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 08/27/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 09/10/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/11/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/11/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 09/17/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/17/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 09/18/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 09/19/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/20/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 09/20/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 09/20/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 09/25/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/25/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/25/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/25/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/25/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 09/25/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 09/25/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/25/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/27/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/27/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 10/04/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 10/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor01/30/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.912. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/30/2019)

Esther Martinez Native American Languages Programs Reauthorization Act

This bill revises a grant program administered by the Administration for Native Americans at the Department of Health and Human Services to preserve Native American languages. The minimum number of enrollees in educational programs funded by grants is reduced from 10 to 5 enrollees in Native American language nests, which provide instruction through the use of a Native American language for children under the age of 7 and their parents. For survival schools, which are programs striving for fluency in a Native American language and proficiency in other academic fields, the minimum number of enrollees is reduced from 15 to 10. The bill increases the maximum duration of grants.

The program is reauthorized through FY2024.