There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Venezuela Arms Restriction Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Venezuela Arms Restriction Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To restrict the transfer of defense articles, defense services, and crime control articles to any element of the security forces of Venezuela that is under the authority of a government of Venezuela that is not recognized as the legitimate government of Venezuela by the Government of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/25/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2767-2768)
01/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
03/26/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
03/25/2019-4:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/25/2019-4:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2767-2768)
03/25/2019-4:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 920.
03/25/2019-4:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2767-2769)
03/25/2019-4:45pmHouseMr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/14/2019HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
03/14/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/14/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
01/30/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/30/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/30/2019 Referred to
03/14/2019 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations03/26/2019 Referred to

As of 02/18/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.920 - Venezuela Arms Restriction Act


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.920. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (03/25/2019)

Venezuela Arms Restriction Act

This bill prohibits the export of weapons and related services to security forces controlled by any Venezuelan government not recognized by the United States.

(The United States recognizes Juan Guaido as interim president, not the government of President Nicolas Maduro.)

The prohibition includes weapons, weapons systems, munitions, and equipment or materials necessary to produce such weapons. Defense services, including testing and repair of weapons, technical assistance, and training, are also prohibited.

The Department of State shall report to Congress on the transfer of the prohibited items and services by foreign persons to the unrecognized Venezuelan government security forces. The report shall also include information on any known use of the prohibited items and services by such security forces.

The unrecognized Venezuelan security forces include (1) the Bolivarian National Armed Forces, including the Bolivarian National Guard; (2) the Bolivarian National Intelligence Service; (3) the Bolivarian National Police; and (4) the Bureau for Scientific, Criminal and Forensic Investigations of the Ministry of Interior, Justice, and Peace.