There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the policy of the United States regarding the no-first-use of nuclear weapons.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/14/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
01/30/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/30/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/08/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/08/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/08/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/08/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 02/08/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/08/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/08/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/08/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 02/15/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/15/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/15/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/25/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/25/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/25/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 02/25/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/25/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/05/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/05/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/05/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/05/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/18/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/01/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 04/01/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 04/01/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 04/18/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/18/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 05/02/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/02/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/02/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/21/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/21/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 05/21/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/11/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/11/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 08/16/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/17/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 10/23/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 10/30/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/30/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/30/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 12/12/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/19/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/04/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/09/2020
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/09/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/10/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/01/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/04/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/13/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/30/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation03/14/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.921. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/30/2019)

This bill establishes that it is U.S. policy to not use nuclear weapons first.