There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (37)

Short Titles

Other Short Titles

The Heroes Act

Other Short Titles for portions of a bill
  • ACCESS Act
  • American Coronavirus/COVID-19 Election Safety and Security Act
  • COVID-19 Every Worker Protection Act of 2020
  • COVID-19 HERO Act
  • COVID-19 Housing, Economic Relief, and Oversight Act
  • COVID-19 Price Gouging Prevention Act
  • COVID-19 Tax Relief Act of 2020
  • Coronavirus Recovery Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2021
  • Emergency Pension Plan Relief Act of 2020
  • GROW Act
  • Giving Retirement Options to Workers Act of 2020
  • Global Health Security Act of 2020
  • Human Services and Community Supports Act
  • Inspector General Independence Act
  • Investing in America's Health Care During the COVID-19 Pandemic Act
  • Jabara-Heyer NO HATE Act
  • Jabara-Heyer National Opposition to Hate, Assault, and Threats to Equality Act of 2020
  • Measuring Real Income Growth Act of 2020
  • PPP and EIDL Enhancement Act of 2020
  • Pandemic Education Response Act
  • Pandemic Justice Response Act
  • Payroll Support Program Extension Act
  • Promoting and Advancing Communities of Color through Inclusive Lending Act
  • RESTAURANTS Act of 2020
  • Real Economic Support That Acknowledges Unique Restaurant Assistance Needed To Survive Act of 2020
  • SAFE Banking Act of 2020
  • Secure And Fair Enforcement Banking Act of 2020
  • Supporting Foster Youth and Families through the Pandemic Act
  • Victims of Crime Act Fix Act of 2020

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

North American Wetlands Conservation Extension Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

North American Wetlands Conservation Extension Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

North American Wetlands Conservation Extension Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

America's Conservation Enhancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To improve protections for wildlife, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the authorization of appropriations for allocation to carry out approved wetlands conservation projects under the North American Wetlands Conservation Act through fiscal year 2024.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An Act to improve protections for wildlife, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
10/01/2020Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion to concur in the Senate amendments with an amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 214 - 207 (Roll no. 214).
01/09/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.(text: CR S148)
11/20/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9083)
11/13/2019Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-284.
01/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/01/2020-8:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/01/2020-8:04pmHouseOn motion to concur in the Senate amendments with an amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 214 - 207 (Roll no. 214). (text: CR H5202-5417)
10/01/2020-7:13pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
10/01/2020-4:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 2 hours of debate on motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments with an amendment.
10/01/2020-4:45pmHouseMrs. Lowey moved that the House concur in the Senate amendments with an amendment. (consideration: CR H5202-5435)
10/01/2020-4:45pmHousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1161, Mrs. Lowey called up H.R. 925, with the Senate Amendments thereto and moved that the House agree in the Senate amendment to the title of H.R. 925 and that the House agree in the Senate amendment to the text of H.R. 925 with an amendment consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 116-66.
09/30/2020-7:01pmHouseRule H. Res. 1161 passed House.
09/30/2020-4:29pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1161 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 925 with 2 hours of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order. Providing for the consideration of the Senate amendments to H.R. 925.
01/13/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/09/2020SenateS.Amdt.1277 Amendment SA 1277 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
01/09/2020SenateS.Amdt.1277 Amendment SA 1277 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Barrasso. (consideration: CR S148; text: CR S148) To amend the title.
01/09/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote. (text: CR S148)
01/09/2020SenateS.Amdt.1276 Amendment SA 1276 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
01/09/2020SenateS.Amdt.1276 Amendment SA 1276 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Barrasso. (consideration: CR S148; text: CR S129-139) In the nature of a substitute.
01/09/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S148)
11/21/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
11/20/2019-2:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/20/2019-2:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9083)
11/20/2019-2:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 925.
11/20/2019-2:40pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9083-9084)
11/20/2019-2:40pmHouseMr. Sablan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/13/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 229.
11/13/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-284.
09/25/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 9.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/25/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/25/2019HouseSubcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
09/24/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
02/19/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/30/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/30/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (34)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources01/30/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Markup by
11/13/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-284
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife02/19/2019 Referred to
09/24/2019 Hearings by
09/25/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (334)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.925. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (11/20/2019)

North American Wetlands Conservation Extension Act

This bill reauthorizes the North American Wetlands Conservation Act through FY2024.