There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Amend the Code for Marriage Equality Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To replace references to "wives" and "husbands" in Federal law with references to "spouses", and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/16/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/16/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/16/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/16/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/16/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 01/16/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/16/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/16/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 01/22/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/22/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/22/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 01/23/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/23/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/24/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/24/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/28/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 01/30/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 01/30/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/30/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/06/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/06/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/06/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 02/08/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 02/11/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/14/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 02/19/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/19/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 03/05/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/05/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/05/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 03/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 03/27/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 04/02/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 04/08/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 05/16/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/04/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/15/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/25/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/30/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/30/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/30/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/30/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/30/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/30/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 08/02/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/02/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 08/02/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 08/02/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 08/02/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 08/02/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 08/02/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/02/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 08/02/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 08/09/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 08/09/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 08/09/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 08/09/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 08/09/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 08/23/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 08/30/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 09/17/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/18/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 09/25/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/25/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/16/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/03/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice01/03/2019 Referred to

As of 10/17/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.94 - Amend the Code for Marriage Equality Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.94. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2019)

Amend the Code for Marriage Equality Act of 2019

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code (IRC), the Social Security Act (SSAct), and other federal laws to replace (1) references to "wife" or "husband" with references to "spouse"; and (2) references to "husband and wife" or "husband or wife" with references to "married couple" or " married person."

For purposes of federal laws or regulations, "marriage" is defined as a legal union between two people as spouses. The bill eliminates a definition of "spouse" that refers only to a person of the opposite sex who is a husband or a wife.

Requirements concerning compensation to a surviving wife after the disability or death of a person employed at a military, air, or naval base outside the United States are revised to make surviving spouses eligible for such compensation.

Under the Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993, provisions concerning the amount of leave available to a husband and wife employed by the same employer are revised to apply to a married couple employed by the same employer.

Requirements under the Federal Mine Safety and Health Act of 1977 that make disability and death benefits payable to the wife or widow of a miner are revised to make the benefits payable to the spouse or surviving spouse of a miner.

IRC provisions that require a divorced wife's gross income to include the income of any trust she is entitled to receive that would otherwise be includible in the gross income of her husband, or vice versa, are revised to apply to the gross income of individuals who are divorced from their spouse.

The bill revises title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the SSAct to consolidate separate provisions for a wife's insurance benefits and a husband's insurance benefits into a single standard for a spouse's insurance benefits.

Criminal penalties that currently apply to persons who threaten to kill, kidnap, or inflict bodily harm upon a former President's wife or widow are revised to apply to threats made to a former President's spouse or surviving spouse.