There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Mental Health Access Improvement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for the coverage of marriage and family therapist services and mental health counselor services under part B of the Medicare program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/31/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
09/09/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/09/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/30/2020Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
02/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/31/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/31/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/31/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/31/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (120)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 01/31/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/13/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/13/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/22/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/25/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/25/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/28/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/07/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 03/07/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 03/07/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/11/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 03/11/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/13/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/13/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 03/13/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 03/25/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/25/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 03/27/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/10/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/10/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/25/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 04/25/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/25/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/25/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 04/25/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 05/01/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/01/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/09/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/20/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/20/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/22/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/03/2019
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/03/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 06/03/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 06/10/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 06/11/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 06/11/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/11/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/12/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/12/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/18/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/18/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 06/18/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 06/20/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 07/09/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/09/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/09/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/09/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/10/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/10/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/17/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/18/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 07/18/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/18/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/22/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 08/06/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/30/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 08/30/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 08/30/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 09/12/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/12/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/12/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/12/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/16/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/16/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/16/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/18/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 09/18/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 09/18/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/24/2019
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/24/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/24/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 09/24/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/04/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/08/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/08/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/17/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 10/17/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 10/17/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 10/21/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/23/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 10/23/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 10/23/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/28/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/28/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/29/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 11/08/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/08/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 11/12/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 11/18/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/21/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/04/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 12/06/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 12/11/2019
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/07/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 01/09/2020
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 01/15/2020
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 01/15/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 01/15/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 02/14/2020
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 02/25/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 02/26/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/04/2020
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/04/2020
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/04/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/11/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 05/05/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/04/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 07/29/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 08/04/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/01/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/01/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/31/2019 Referred to
09/09/2020 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/01/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/31/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health01/31/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.945. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/31/2019)

Mental Health Access Improvement Act of 2019

This bill provides for coverage of marriage and family therapist services and mental health counselor services under Medicare. It also excludes such services from the skilled nursing facility prospective payment system, and authorizes marriage and family therapists and mental health counselors to develop discharge plans for post-hospital services.