There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stopping Bad Robocalls Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to clarify the prohibitions on making robocalls, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
04/30/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
02/05/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/04/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/04/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/04/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 02/04/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/04/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 02/11/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/11/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/11/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/11/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/13/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 02/26/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/26/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 03/07/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 03/21/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/21/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 03/29/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/29/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 04/03/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 04/03/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/09/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/09/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/09/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 04/25/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/29/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/29/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 04/29/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 04/29/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/29/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 05/01/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/01/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 05/09/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 05/17/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/17/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/17/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/17/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/03/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 06/03/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/12/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/13/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 06/18/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/22/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 12/19/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/04/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology02/05/2019 Referred to
04/30/2019 Hearings by

As of 10/27/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.946 - Stopping Bad Robocalls Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.