There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Free Speech Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow charitable organizations to make statements relating to political campaigns if such statements are made in the ordinary course of carrying out its tax exempt purpose.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/04/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 02/06/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 02/06/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 02/06/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/06/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/06/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 02/06/2019
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/06/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/07/2019
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6] 02/07/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/07/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/08/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 02/11/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/11/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 02/11/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 02/13/2019
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 02/13/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/13/2019
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 02/13/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 02/14/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 02/14/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 02/19/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/19/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/25/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/25/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/25/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 02/25/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 02/26/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/26/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 03/05/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/06/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 03/14/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 03/25/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/26/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/04/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.949. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/2019)

Free Speech Fairness Act

This bill permits a tax-exempt organization to make certain statements related to a political campaign without losing its tax-exempt status. An organization may not lose its tax-exempt status under section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code or be deemed to have participated in, or intervened in any political campaign on behalf of (or in opposition to) any candidate for public office, solely because of the content of any statement that (1) is made in the ordinary course of the organization's regular and customary activities in carrying out its exempt purpose, and (2) results in the organization incurring not more than de minimis incremental expenses.