There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Saving Children Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit dismemberment abortions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/22/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/04/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 02/05/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 02/05/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/05/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/06/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/08/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 02/11/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/11/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/11/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/11/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 02/11/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/11/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 02/14/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 02/14/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 02/14/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 02/14/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/14/2019
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 02/14/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 02/19/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 02/25/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 03/05/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/05/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 03/07/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 04/01/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/04/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/22/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.956. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/2019)

Saving Children Act

This bill establishes a new criminal offense that prohibits a physician from knowingly performing a dismemberment abortion. It provides a definition of the term "dismemberment abortion."

A physician who performs a dismemberment abortion is subject to a criminal fine, up to two years in prison, or both, unless the dismemberment abortion was necessary to save the mother's life.

A woman or a parent of a minor who undergoes a dismemberment abortion may file a civil action for damages against an individual who violates this bill.

The legislation bars the criminal prosecution of a woman who undergoes a dismemberment abortion for conspiracy to violate the provisions of this bill, for being a principal or an accessory after the fact, or for concealing a dismemberment abortion.