There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protect our Girls Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to provide that traveling interstate or causing another to travel interstate for the purpose of female genital mutilation is prohibited, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/22/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/04/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/05/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/14/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 02/14/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/14/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/22/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 03/04/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/04/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 03/05/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/06/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/11/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 03/11/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/11/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/11/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/11/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/11/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 03/11/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/11/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/14/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/14/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/14/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/14/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/14/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 03/14/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/14/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/02/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 04/30/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/21/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/23/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/03/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 06/05/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/18/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 07/18/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/18/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/23/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 08/02/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 09/09/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/09/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 09/09/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/25/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 10/11/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 11/15/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 11/19/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/04/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/22/2019 Referred to

As of 09/20/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.959 - Protect our Girls Act of 2019


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.959. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/2019)

Protect our Girls Act of 2019

This bill criminalizes additional conduct with respect to female genital mutilation. Specifically, it prohibits interstate travel to commit or facilitate female genital mutilation.