There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to furnish dental care in the same manner as any other medical service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 01/09/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/09/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/09/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/09/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/09/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 01/09/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/09/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/09/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/09/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/09/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/09/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/09/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/09/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/09/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/09/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/09/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/09/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/09/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/10/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/10/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 01/10/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/10/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/14/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/14/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/14/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/14/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/22/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/29/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 01/29/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/06/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/06/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/06/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 02/06/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/14/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/14/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/26/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 02/26/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 03/04/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 03/07/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 03/07/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/12/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/12/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/03/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health01/16/2019 Referred to

As of 03/21/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.96 - To amend title 38, United States Code, to require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to furnish dental care in the same manner as any other medical service, and for other purposes..


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.