There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Empower our Girls Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To allow certain grants to be used for the purpose of assisting victims of female genital mutilation, to classify the offense of female genital mutilation as a part II crime for purposes of the Uniform Crime Reports, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
03/22/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/04/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/05/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/14/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/14/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/22/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 03/04/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/04/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 03/05/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/06/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/06/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/11/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 03/11/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/11/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/11/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/11/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/11/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 03/11/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/14/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/14/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/14/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/14/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/14/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 03/14/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/14/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/02/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/21/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 09/09/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/09/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 09/25/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/25/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 09/25/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 10/11/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 10/18/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 10/23/2019
Resident Commissioner Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 11/15/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/17/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/04/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/22/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services02/04/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.960.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.960. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/2019)

Empower our Girls Act

This bill allows certain grants, which are authorized under the Violence Against Women Act to assist victims of violence and assault, to be used to assist victims of female genital mutilation. It also requires the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) to classify the offense of female genital mutilation as a Part II crime in the Uniform Crime Reports. (The FBI compiles crime statistics through the Uniform Crime Reporting Program and periodically releases these reports to the public.)