There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Safeguard American Food Exports Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prevent human health threats posed by the consumption of equines raised in the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/04/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (151)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 02/04/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/08/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/08/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/08/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 02/08/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 02/08/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 02/08/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/08/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 02/08/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/08/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/08/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 02/13/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/13/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/13/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 02/13/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 02/13/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/13/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/13/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 02/13/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 02/13/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/13/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 02/13/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 02/13/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/13/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/13/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/13/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/13/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/13/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/14/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/14/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 02/14/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/14/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 02/14/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/14/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 02/22/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/22/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/22/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/22/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 02/22/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/22/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/22/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/22/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/22/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 02/22/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/22/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 02/22/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/22/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/22/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/22/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/25/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/25/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 02/25/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 02/25/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/25/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/25/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/25/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/25/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/27/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/27/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/27/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/27/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 02/27/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/27/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/27/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/27/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 02/27/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/27/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/04/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 03/04/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/04/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 03/04/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 03/04/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 03/04/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/04/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 03/04/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/04/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/04/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/04/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/04/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/04/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/04/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/04/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 03/04/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/04/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/18/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/18/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/18/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 03/18/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/18/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 03/18/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/18/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/18/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 03/18/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/18/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 03/18/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 03/18/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 03/18/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 03/18/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/18/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/18/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 03/18/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 03/18/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/18/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/18/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/18/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/18/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/18/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 03/18/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 03/18/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 03/18/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 03/28/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/28/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 03/28/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/28/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 03/28/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/28/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 03/28/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 04/09/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 04/09/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 04/09/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 04/09/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/09/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 04/09/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/09/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/09/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 04/09/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/10/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/10/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/12/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/12/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/12/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 04/15/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 04/18/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/25/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/25/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 04/25/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/01/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 05/09/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 05/14/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/17/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 05/20/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 06/03/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 06/03/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/10/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 06/11/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/04/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture02/04/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture03/01/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.