There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

AVERT Future Gun Violence Act of 2019
Animal Violence Exposes Real Threat of Future Gun Violence Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit the possession of a firearm by, or the disposition of a firearm to, a person who has been convicted of a misdemeanor crime of animal cruelty.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/22/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/05/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/05/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/20/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 08/23/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/05/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/22/2019 Referred to

As of 11/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.971 - AVERT Future Gun Violence Act of 2019


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.971. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/05/2019)

Animal Violence Exposes Real Threat of Future Gun Violence Act of 2019 or the AVERT Future Gun Violence Act of 2019

The bill expands the categories of persons who are prohibited from receiving or possessing a firearm.

Specifically, it prohibits firearm sale or transfer to and receipt or possession by an individual who has been convicted in any court of a misdemeanor crime of animal cruelty.