There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Clean and Efficient Cars Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To preserve appropriate and achievable Federal standards for greenhouse gas emissions and corporate average fuel economy for cars and light trucks through model year 2025, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/05/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/05/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/05/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/05/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 02/05/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 02/08/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/08/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/08/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/08/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 02/08/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/08/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/08/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/08/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/08/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/08/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/08/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/08/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/08/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/13/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/13/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 02/13/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/13/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/13/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/13/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/13/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/13/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/13/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/13/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/13/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/13/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/13/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/13/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/13/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/13/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/25/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/25/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/25/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/25/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 02/25/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 02/25/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/25/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 03/05/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 03/14/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 03/14/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/03/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/14/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/19/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/19/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/19/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/19/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 07/18/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/08/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/24/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 02/04/2020
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/27/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/05/2019 Referred to

As of 04/05/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.978 - Clean and Efficient Cars Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.978. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/05/2019)

Clean and Efficient Cars Act of 2019

This bill provides statutory authority for rules concerning corporate average fuel economy (CAFE) standards for automobiles with model years 2021 through 2025 and greenhouse gas emission standards for light-duty vehicles (e.g., trucks) with model years 2017 through 2025. Specifically, the bill provides statutory authority for rules issued in 2012 by the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration (NHTSA) on the CAFE standards and the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) on the greenhouse gas emission standards.

NHTSA and the EPA may not take actions that could reduce the stringency of the standards.