There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
04/10/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2392)
04/08/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3107)
04/02/2019Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-30.
02/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
04/11/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/10/2019SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2392)
04/09/2019SenateReceived in the Senate.
04/08/2019-4:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/08/2019-4:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3107)
04/08/2019-4:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 16.
04/08/2019-4:45pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3106-3107)
04/08/2019-4:45pmHouseMrs. Craig moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
04/02/2019HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 16.
04/02/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-30.
02/27/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
02/27/2019HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged.
02/27/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/08/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/08/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
02/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 02/08/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/08/2019 Referred to
02/27/2019 Markup by
04/02/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-30
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management02/08/2019 Referred to
02/27/2019 Discharged from

As of 10/15/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.Con.Res.16 - Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.Con.Res.16. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (04/10/2019)

This concurrent resolution permits the Grand Lodge of the Fraternal Order of Police and its auxiliary to sponsor as free public events on the Capitol grounds

  • the 38th Annual National Peace Officers Memorial Service, on May 15, 2019, to honor the law enforcement officers who died in the line of duty during 2018; and
  • the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition, on May 14, 2019, to allow law enforcement representatives to exhibit their ability to demonstrate Honor Guard programs and provide for a bagpipe exhibition.