There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the Greater Washington Soap Box Derby.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
04/10/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2392-2393)
04/08/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 0 (Roll no. 157).(text: CR H3107-3108)
04/02/2019Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-31.
02/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/11/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/10/2019SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2392-2393)
04/09/2019SenateReceived in the Senate.
04/08/2019-6:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/08/2019-6:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 0 (Roll no. 157). (text: CR H3107-3108)
04/08/2019-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3115-3116)
04/08/2019-5:02pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/08/2019-4:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 19.
04/08/2019-4:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3107-3109)
04/08/2019-4:51pmHouseMrs. Craig moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
04/02/2019HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 17.
04/02/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-31.
02/27/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/27/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/27/2019HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged.
02/15/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/14/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
02/14/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/14/2019 Referred to
02/27/2019 Markup by
04/02/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-31
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management02/15/2019 Referred to
02/27/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.Con.Res.19. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (04/10/2019)

This concurrent resolution permits the Greater Washington Soap Box Derby Association to sponsor soap box derby races as a free public event on the Capitol grounds on June 15, 2019.