There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress that the report of Special Counsel Mueller should be made available to the public and to Congress.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/14/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 420 - 0, 4 Present (Roll no. 125).(text: CR H2723)
03/07/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
03/14/2019SenateReceived in the Senate.
03/14/2019-10:31amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/14/2019-10:31amHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 420 - 0, 4 Present (Roll no. 125). (text: CR H2723)
03/14/2019-10:01amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
03/14/2019-9:15amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Con. Res. 24.
03/14/2019-9:14amHouseRule provides for consideration of H. Con. Res. 24 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions. Rule provides for consideration H. Con. Res. 24 under a closed rule; Rule also provides for proceedings during the period from March 15, 2019, through March 22, 2019
03/14/2019-9:14amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 208. (consideration: CR H2723-2732)
03/13/2019-2:00pmHouseRule H. Res. 208 passed House.
03/11/2019-6:44pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 208 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H. Con. Res. 24 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions. Rule provides for consideration H. Con. Res. 24 under a closed rule; Rule also provides for proceedings during the period from March 15, 2019, through March 22, 2019
03/07/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/07/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/07/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.24. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (03/14/2019)

This concurrent resolution calls for the full release to Congress and the public release, as allowed by law, of any report (including findings) Special Counsel Mueller provides to the Department of Justice.