There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall for a ceremony as part of the commemoration of the days of remembrance of victims of the Holocaust.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
04/11/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2456)
04/09/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H3168)
04/09/2019Committee on House Administration discharged.
04/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/12/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/11/2019SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2456)
04/10/2019SenateReceived in the Senate.
04/09/2019-3:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/09/2019-3:13pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H3168)
04/09/2019-3:12pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3168)
04/09/2019HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
04/09/2019-3:12pmHouseMs. Lofgren asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
04/03/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
04/03/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 04/03/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/03/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Committee on House Administration04/03/2019 Referred to
04/09/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.31. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (04/11/2019)

This concurrent resolution authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center on April 29, 2019, for a ceremony as part of the commemoration of the days of remembrance of victims of the Holocaust.