There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting efforts to enact a bold jobs and infrastructure package that benefits all Americans, not just billionaires.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/25/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
04/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/25/2019Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (106)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 04/25/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/25/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/25/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/25/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/25/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 04/25/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/25/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/25/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/01/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/10/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/15/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/15/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/15/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/15/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 05/15/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 05/15/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/15/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 05/15/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/17/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/17/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/17/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/22/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 05/23/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/23/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/25/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation04/26/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation04/26/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management04/26/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit04/26/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials04/26/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment04/26/2019 Referred to

As of 08/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.Con.Res.36 - Supporting efforts to enact a bold jobs and infrastructure package that benefits all Americans, not just billionaires.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.36. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/25/2019)

This concurrent resolution expresses the sense of Congress regarding requirements and priorities for any infrastructure plan passed by Congress.