There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the clean vehicle emissions standards of the United States and defending the authority of States under the Clean Air Act to protect the people of those States from harmful air pollution.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/19/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
09/19/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/19/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (91)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 09/19/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/19/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 09/20/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/24/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 09/24/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 09/24/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/01/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 10/04/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/08/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/11/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/18/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/29/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/19/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.65. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/19/2019)

This concurrent resolution supports existing regulations with the goals of (1) reducing greenhouse gas emissions and oil usage, and (2) protecting national security and human health and welfare. The concurrent resolution also supports policies that will help meet these goals, such as policies that achieve maximum feasible reductions in oil use.