There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for a joint session of Congress to receive a message from the President.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/30/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S751)
01/28/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H607)
01/28/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/31/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/30/2020SenateReceived in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S751)
01/28/2020-4:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/28/2020-4:23pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H607)
01/28/2020-4:22pmHouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H607)
01/28/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 07/07/2020 text has not been received for H.Con.Res.86 - Providing for a joint session of Congress to receive a message from the President.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.86. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (01/30/2020)

This concurrent resolution provides for a joint session of Congress on February 4, 2020, to receive a message from the President.