There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making further continuing appropriations for the Department of Homeland Security for fiscal year 2019, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
01/03/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 239 - 192 (Roll no. 9).
01/03/2019Committee on Appropriations discharged.
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
02/11/2019SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (CR S1155)
02/11/2019SenateCloture motion on the motion to proceed to the consideration of measure presented in Senate. (CR S1155)
02/11/2019SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S1152)
01/08/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 6.
01/04/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
01/03/2019-9:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/03/2019-9:35pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 239 - 192 (Roll no. 9). (text: CR H190)
01/03/2019-9:26pmHouseOn motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 197 - 233 (Roll no. 8).
01/03/2019-8:55pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered without objection.
01/03/2019-8:54pmHouseFloor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes on the Granger motion to recommit.
01/03/2019-8:54pmHouseMs. Granger moved to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations.
01/03/2019-8:53pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
01/03/2019-8:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with thirty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 1.
01/03/2019-8:23pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 5. (consideration: CR H190-196)
01/03/2019HouseCommittee on Appropriations discharged.
01/03/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
01/03/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations01/03/2019 Referred to
01/03/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.J.Res.1. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (01/03/2019)

This joint resolution provides continuing FY2019 appropriations for the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) through the earlier of February 8, 2019, or the enactment of the applicable appropriations legislation.

It is known as a continuing resolution (CR) and ends the partial DHS shutdown that began on December 22, 2018, because the existing CR expired and the FY2019 DHS appropriations bill has not been enacted.

The CR also

  • compensates DHS employees furloughed as a result of any lapse in appropriations that began on or about December 22, 2018, and ended upon the enactment of this joint resolution;
  • reimburses or compensates certain states, federal grantees, and furloughed state employees for the lapse in DHS appropriations; and
  • ratifies and approves certain obligations incurred in anticipation of the appropriations made and the authority granted by this joint resolution.

Additionally, the CR has the effect of extending through February 8, 2019, several immigration programs and authorities that were extended in prior CRs and expired on December 21, 2018.