There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2019

Short Titles on Conference report

Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2019

Official Titles

Official Title as Agreed to by House and Senate

Making consolidated appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making further continuing appropriations for the Department of Homeland Security for fiscal year 2019, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (11)

Date
02/15/2019Became Public Law No: 116-6.
02/15/2019Signed by President.
02/15/2019Presented to President.
02/14/2019Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 300 - 128 (Roll No. 87).(text: CR 2/13/2019 H1590-1713)
02/14/2019Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 83 - 16. Record Vote Number: 26.
02/13/2019Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 116-9 filed.
02/13/2019Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
01/30/2019Conference committee actions: Conference held.
01/25/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
01/24/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 180 (Roll no. 51).(text: CR H1176-1177)
01/22/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (45)

Date Chamber
02/15/2019Became Public Law No: 116-6.
02/15/2019Signed by President.
02/15/2019HousePresented to President.
02/14/2019-9:15pmHousePursuant to the provisions of S. Con. Res. 4, enrollment corrections on H.J. Res. 31 have been made.
02/14/2019-9:01pmHouseMotions to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/14/2019-9:01pmHouseOn agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 300 - 128 (Roll No. 87). (text: CR 2/13/2019 H1590-1713)
02/14/2019-8:36pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
02/14/2019-7:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on the conference report to accompany H.J.Res. 31.
02/14/2019-7:37pmHouseMrs. Lowey brought up conference report H. Rept. 116-9 for consideration under the provisions of H. Res. 131. (consideration: CR H2016-2024)
02/14/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/14/2019SenateSenate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 83 - 16. Record Vote Number: 26.
02/14/2019SenateCloture on the conference report invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 84 - 15. Record Vote Number: 25. (CR S1364)
02/14/2019SenateCloture motion on the conference report presented in Senate. (CR S1362)
02/14/2019SenateConference report considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S1362-1364)
02/14/2019SenateConference papers: Senate report and manager's statement and official papers held at the desk in Senate.
02/13/2019-11:51pmHouseConference report H. Rept. 116-9 filed.
02/13/2019-11:30pmConferees agreed to file conference report.
Action By: Joint
01/30/2019-1:30pmConference held.
Action By: Joint
01/25/2019-6:59pmHouseThe Speaker appointed conferees: Lowey, Roybal-Allard, Price of North Carolina, Lee of California, Cuellar, Aguilar, Granger, Fleischmann, Graves of Georgia, and Palazzo. (consideration: CR S684)
01/25/2019-6:59pmHouseOn motion that the House disagree to the Senate amendment, and agree to a conference Agreed to without objection.
01/25/2019-6:58pmHouseMrs. Lowey asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table, with the Senate amendment thereto, disagree to the Senate amendment, and agree to the conference requested by the Senate. (consideration: CR H1216)
01/25/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/25/2019SenateSenate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Shelby; Capito; Hoeven; Blunt; Leahy; Durbin; Tester.
01/25/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
01/25/2019SenateS.Amdt.55 Amendment SA 55 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
01/25/2019SenateS.Amdt.55 Amendment SA 55 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Shelby. (consideration: CR S684; text: CR S684) In the nature of a substitute.
01/25/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S684)
01/25/2019SenateThe joint resolution was considered read the second time.
01/24/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
01/24/2019-10:50amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/24/2019-10:50amHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 180 (Roll no. 51). (text: CR H1176-1177)
01/24/2019-10:41amHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 200 - 214 (Roll no. 50).
01/24/2019-10:16amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1181-1183)
01/24/2019-9:57amHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the motion and by voice vote, announced that the nays had prevailed. Ms. Granger demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit until later in the legislative day.
01/24/2019-9:57amHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
01/24/2019-9:57amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Granger motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment striking the date February 28, 2019 and inserting January 24, 2019 on page 2, line 10.
01/24/2019-9:54amHouseMs. Granger moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Appropriations. (text: CR H1181)
01/24/2019-9:53amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
01/24/2019-9:10amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 31.
01/24/2019-9:09amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 648 and H.J. Res. 31. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 648 and H.J. Res. 31 under closed rules with one hour of debate for each measure. Rule provides for consideration of motions to suspend the rules through the legislative day of February 1, 2019
01/24/2019-9:09amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 61. (consideration: CR H1176-1181)
01/23/2019-1:57pmHouseRule H. Res. 61 passed House.
01/22/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
01/22/2019-7:17pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 61 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 648 and H.J. Res. 31. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 648 and H.J. Res. 31 under closed rules with one hour of debate for each measure. Rule provides for consideration of motions to suspend the rules through the legislative day of February 1, 2019
01/22/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations01/22/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (150)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.J.Res.31. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (01/25/2019)

This joint resolution provides continuing FY2019 appropriations for the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) through the earlier of February 15, 2019, or the enactment of the applicable appropriations legislation.

It is known as a continuing resolution (CR) and ends the partial DHS shutdown that began on December 22, 2018, because the existing CR expired and the FY2019 DHS appropriations bill has not been enacted.

Additionally, the CR has the effect of extending through February 15, 2019, several immigration programs and authorities that were extended in prior CRs and expired on December 21, 2018.