Text: H.J.Res.60 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-28 (07/05/2019)

 
[116th Congress Public Law 28]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 133 STAT. 1029]]

Public Law 116-28
116th Congress

                            Joint Resolution


 
  Requesting the Secretary of the Interior to authorize unique and one-
 time arrangements for displays on the National Mall and the Washington 
Monument during the period beginning on July 16, 2019 and ending on July 
           20, 2019. <<NOTE: July 5, 2019 -  [H.J. Res. 60]>> 

Whereas Congress enacted the Act of August 12, 1946 (60 Stat. 997; ch. 
    955, 1), to establish a National Air Museum, later known as the 
    Smithsonian's National Air and Space Museum (NASM), to commemorate 
    and memorialize the American story of human flight in the atmosphere 
    and in outer space;

Whereas Congress enacted the Act of July 29, 1958 (commonly known as the 
    National Aeronautics and Space Act) (72 Stat. 426-438; 42 U.S.C. 
    2451 et seq.), to declare a policy of peaceful space activities 
    designed for the benefit of humankind and to establish the National 
    Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA);

Whereas in July of 1960, NASA announced the creation of the Apollo 
    Program, the Nation's first orchestrated initiative to ferry 
    humankind out of Earth's orbit and to the Moon;

Whereas on July 20, 1969, the Apollo 11 Mission succeeded in landing the 
    spacecraft Eagle on the surface of the Moon, piloted by two American 
    astronauts, the first humans to ever make landfall on another 
    celestial body;

Whereas on July 20 and 21, 1969, those brave Americans became the first 
    humans to set foot on the surface of the Moon, forever changing 
    Earth's relationship with the heavens;

Whereas this momentous event was watched in wonder by hundreds of 
    millions of people back on Earth, including the hundreds of 
    thousands of NASA civilian and military staff and partners who made 
    the Apollo Program possible;

Whereas the Apollo Program continued through December of 1972 and 
    spurred the greatest development of human scientific and 
    technological understanding of any decade to that point, leading to 
    advances in rocketry, spaceflight, avionics, telecommunications, and 
    computers, on which the American public still relies today;

Whereas the National Air and Space Museum opened on the American 
    Bicentennial in July 1976 as a birthday gift to the country in 
    celebration of the Nation's highest achievements, under the 
    leadership and vision of Museum Director, NASA astronaut, and Apollo 
    11 Command Module Pilot Michael Collins;

Whereas NASA continues to pursue space exploration on behalf of the 
    American people to increase humankind's understanding of the 
    heavens; and


[[Page 133 STAT. 1030]]


Whereas the National Air and Space Museum continues to memorialize the 
    history of American discovery and invention, and seeks to educate 
    and inspire new generations of innovators and explorers to ensure 
    that our future achievements in space are fully empowered by the 
    achievements of the past: Now, therefore, be it

    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled, That Congress--
            (1) <<NOTE: Time period.>>  requests the Secretary of the 
        Interior to authorize unique and one-time arrangements for the 
        display of NASA and Smithsonian artifacts, digital content, film 
        footage, and associated historic audio and imagery, in and 
        around the vicinity of the National Mall, including projected 
        onto the surface of the Washington Monument for five nights of 
        public display during the period beginning on July 16, 2019 and 
        ending on July 20, 2019; and
            (2) respectfully requests that the Clerk of the House of 
        Representatives transmit an enrolled copy of this resolution to 
        the Secretary of the Smithsonian Institution and Director of the 
        National Air and Space Museum.

    Approved July 5, 2019.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.J. Res. 60:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 165 (2019):
            June 10, considered and passed House.
            June 18, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>