Text: H.J.Res.74 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/02/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. J. RES. 74


Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Secretary of the Treasury and the Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to “State Relief and Empowerment Waivers”.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

August 2, 2019

Ms. Kuster of New Hampshire (for herself, Ms. Schakowsky, Ms. Blunt Rochester, Mr. Tonko, Ms. Barragán, Ms. Matsui, Mr. Schrader, Ms. Mucarsel-Powell, Mr. Cárdenas, Ms. Norton, Mr. Rush, Mr. Cooper, Mr. O'Halleran, Ms. Wild, Mr. Suozzi, Mr. Welch, Mr. McNerney, Mrs. Dingell, Mr. Trone, Ms. Castor of Florida, Mr. Espaillat, Mrs. Carolyn B. Maloney of New York, Mr. Cohen, Mr. Garamendi, Mr. Pappas, and Mr. Khanna) submitted the following joint resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


JOINT RESOLUTION

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Secretary of the Treasury and the Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to “State Relief and Empowerment Waivers”.

Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, That Congress disapproves the rule submitted by the Secretary of the Treasury and the Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to “State Relief and Empowerment Waivers” under section 1332 of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (issued October 24, 2018, as a guidance and printed at 83 Fed. Reg. 53575, and a letter of opinion from the Government Accountability Office dated July 15, 2019, printed in the Congressional Record on July 17, 2019, on pages S4901–S4903, concluding that such guidance is a rule under the Congressional Review Act), and such rule shall have no force or effect.