There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the 100th anniversary of Easterseals, a leading advocate and service provider for children and adults with disabilities, veterans, older adults, caregivers, and their families.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
02/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/05/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E134)
02/05/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/05/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Rose, John W. [R-TN-6]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 02/05/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/05/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/11/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/11/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/11/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 02/11/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/11/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/19/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/19/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 03/05/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 03/05/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/05/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/05/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/08/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 03/18/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 04/02/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 04/02/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/02/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/02/2019
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 04/25/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/25/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 04/25/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/25/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/25/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 04/25/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 04/25/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 04/25/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 04/25/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/25/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 04/25/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/25/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 05/02/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/02/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 05/10/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 05/10/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 05/10/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/10/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor02/05/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs02/05/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/08/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.100. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/05/2019)

This resolution recognizes the organization Easterseals for its impact over the past 100 years and its commitment to helping children and adults with disabilities, veterans, seniors, and others to live, learn, work, and play in communities.