There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress that the date of the 2020 United States Presidential election shall be held on November 3, 2020.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/31/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/31/2020Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
07/31/2020Introduced in House

Cosponsors (70)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/31/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 07/31/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 08/04/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 08/04/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/04/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 08/04/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 08/04/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 08/04/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 08/07/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 08/07/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 08/07/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 08/07/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 08/07/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 08/07/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 08/07/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 08/07/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 08/07/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 08/07/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 08/07/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 08/14/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 08/14/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 08/14/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/04/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 09/21/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/29/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Committee on House Administration07/31/2020 Referred to

As of 10/28/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.1076 - Expressing the sense of Congress that the date of the 2020 United States Presidential election shall be held on November 3, 2020.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.1076. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/31/2020)

This resolution confirms that the 2020 presidential election shall be held on November 3, 2020. It recognizes that the United States shall hold elections as constitutionally mandated and legally authorized.