There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the duty of the Federal Government to implement an agenda to Transform, Heal, and Renew by Investing in a Vibrant Economy ("THRIVE").


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/11/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date All Actions
09/16/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
09/16/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
09/16/2020Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
09/14/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
09/14/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
09/14/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
09/14/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
09/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/11/2020Introduced in House

Cosponsors (89)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 09/11/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/11/2020
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 09/11/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 09/11/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 09/11/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 09/11/2020
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/24/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/24/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/24/2020
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 09/24/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 09/24/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/24/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 09/24/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 09/24/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/13/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/13/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/16/2020
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/16/2020

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor09/11/2020 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce09/11/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/11/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit09/14/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials09/14/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation09/14/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment09/14/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources09/11/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States09/16/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands09/16/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife09/16/2020 Referred to
House Agriculture09/11/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.