There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for the designation of the 17th day in May as "DIPG Awareness Day" to raise awareness and encourage research into cures for diffuse intrinsic pontine glioma (DIPG) and pediatric cancers in general.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/11/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
02/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/08/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/08/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 02/08/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/19/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/19/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/19/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/25/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 03/05/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/05/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/05/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 03/05/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 03/07/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/14/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/14/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 03/25/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 04/03/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/25/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/01/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/02/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/07/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 05/08/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 05/08/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 05/10/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 05/10/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 05/20/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/21/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/04/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 06/19/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 06/19/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/25/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 06/25/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 09/10/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 09/10/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/17/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/17/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 09/17/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 09/17/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/17/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/17/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/17/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/18/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 09/19/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 09/19/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/19/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 09/24/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 10/04/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/04/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/08/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/11/2019 Referred to

As of 10/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.114 - Expressing support for the designation of the 17th day in May as "DIPG Awareness Day" to raise awareness and encourage research into cures for diffuse intrinsic pontine glioma (DIPG) and pediatric cancers in general.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.114. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/08/2019)

This resolution expresses support for the designation of DIPG Awareness Day. (DIPG is diffuse intrinsic pontine glioma, a terminal childhood brain cancer.)

It also encourages public and private sources of research funding to elevate their consideration of the mortality rate of a type of cancer as well as the life years lost as factors considered during the grant application process.