There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning the Government of Saudi Arabia's continued detention and alleged abuse of women's rights activists.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/15/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5800-5801)
02/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
07/15/2019-4:19pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/15/2019-4:19pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5800-5801)
07/15/2019-4:12pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 129.
07/15/2019-4:12pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5800-5802)
07/15/2019-4:11pmMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
05/22/2019Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
05/22/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/22/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/13/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E301)
02/13/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/13/2019Introduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/13/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by

As of 12/11/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.129 - Condemning the Government of Saudi Arabia's continued detention and alleged abuse of women's rights activists.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.129. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (07/15/2019)

This resolution reaffirms that the promotion of human rights and democracies, including the empowerment of women and girls, is a longstanding bedrock of U.S. foreign policy. It also condemns Saudi Arabia's continued detention and alleged abuse of women's rights advocates and urges the immediate and unconditional release of such advocates. The resolution also urges Saudi Arabia to end its male guardianship system and calls on the United States to impose sanctions on Saudi Arabian government officials responsible for gross human rights violations.