There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the seriousness of polycystic ovary syndrome (PCOS) and expressing support for the designation of the month of September 2019 as "PCOS Awareness Month".


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/25/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
02/25/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/25/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (123)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/25/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/25/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 02/25/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 02/25/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/18/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 03/18/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/18/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/18/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 03/18/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/18/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/18/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 03/18/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/18/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 03/18/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/18/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 03/18/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/18/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/18/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/18/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 04/18/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 04/25/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/25/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/03/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/10/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/24/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 05/24/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 06/05/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 06/14/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 08/16/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/12/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/12/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/12/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/16/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 09/16/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 09/16/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/16/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 09/17/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/17/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/18/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/18/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/18/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/18/2019
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 09/18/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/20/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/20/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 09/20/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/20/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/20/2019
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 09/20/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/20/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/20/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 09/20/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/20/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/20/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 09/20/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 09/20/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 09/20/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 09/20/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/26/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/26/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 09/26/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/27/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 09/27/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/04/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 10/04/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/04/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/11/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/16/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/18/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 10/22/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 10/22/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/25/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.146. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/25/2019)

This resolution expresses support for the goals and ideals of Polycystic Ovary Syndrome (PCOS) Awareness Month. PCOS is caused by a hormone imbalance. Symptoms can include infertility, weight gain, excess hair growth, and acne.

It recognizes the need for further research, improved treatment and care options, and a cure for PCOS.

It also acknowledges the struggles affecting all women and girls afflicted with PCOS.