Text: H.Res.149 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/26/2019)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 149 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






116th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. RES. 149

    Recognizing the national debt as a threat to national security.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                           February 26, 2019

  Mr. Biggs (for himself, Mr. Arrington, Mr. Balderson, Mr. Brooks of 
  Alabama, Mr. Buck, Mr. Budd, Mr. Burchett, Mr. Cloud, Mr. Cole, Mr. 
Davidson of Ohio, Mr. DesJarlais, Mr. Duncan, Mr. Gaetz, Mr. Gibbs, Mr. 
    Gosar, Mr. Gohmert, Mr. Grothman, Mr. Harris, Mr. Kevin Hern of 
   Oklahoma, Mr. Holding, Mr. Jordan, Mrs. Lesko, Mr. Marshall, Mr. 
 McClintock, Mr. Meadows, Mr. Mooney of West Virginia, Mr. Norman, Mr. 
  Palmer, Mr. Perry, Mr. Posey, Mr. Roy, Mr. Schweikert, Mr. Weber of 
Texas, Mr. Webster of Florida, Mr. Williams, Mr. Wright, Mr. Babin, Mr. 
  Cline, Mr. Green of Tennessee, Mr. Hice of Georgia, Mr. Johnson of 
   Louisiana, Mr. Newhouse, Mr. Spano, Mr. Westerman, Mr. Yoho, Mr. 
  Smucker, Mr. Steube, Mr. Walker, Mr. Armstrong, Mr. Emmer, and Mr. 
Timmons) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
 Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and 
 Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in 
   each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the 
                jurisdiction of the committee concerned

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
    Recognizing the national debt as a threat to national security.

Whereas, in February 2019, the total public debt outstanding was more than 
        $22,000,000,000,000, resulting in a total interest expense of more than 
        $192,000,000,000 for fiscal year 2019;
Whereas, on December 21, 2018, the total public debt as a percentage of gross 
        domestic product was 104 percent;
Whereas the last balanced Federal budget was signed into law in 1997;
Whereas, in fiscal year 2018, Federal tax receipts totaled $3,329,000,000,000, 
        but Federal outlays totaled $4,108,000,000,000, leaving the Federal 
        Government with a 1-year deficit of $779,000,000,000;
Whereas, every year since the last balanced Federal budget was signed in 1997, 
        Congress has failed to maintain a fiscally responsible budget and has 
        typically relied on raising the debt ceiling;
Whereas the House of Representatives failed to pass a balanced budget for fiscal 
        year 2019 and failed to restore regular order to the legislative process 
        by not allowing Representatives to offer and debate amendments;
Whereas regular order permits the House of Representatives to separately debate 
        and adopt all appropriations bills in a timely fashion and facilitates 
        congressional oversight of Federal spending;
Whereas the Social Security and Medicare Boards of Trustees project that the 
        Federal Hospital Insurance Trust Fund will be depleted in 2026;
Whereas the Social Security and Medicare Boards of Trustees project that the 
        Federal Old-Age and Survivors Insurance Trust Fund and the Federal 
        Disability Insurance Trust Fund will be depleted in 2034;
Whereas the credit rating of the United States was reduced by Standard and 
        Poor's from AAA to AA+ on August 5, 2011, and has remained at that level 
        since that date;
Whereas, without a targeted effort to balance the Federal budget, the credit 
        rating of the United States is certain to continue to fall;
Whereas the National Security Strategy issued by President Donald Trump 
        highlights the need to reduce the national debt through fiscal 
        responsibility;
Whereas, on April 12, 2018, former Secretary of Defense James Mattis warned that 
        ``any Nation that can't keep its fiscal house in order eventually cannot 
        maintain its military power'';
Whereas, on March 6, 2018, Director of National Intelligence Dan Coats warned: 
        ``Our continued plunge into debt is unsustainable and represents a dire 
        future threat to our economy and to our national security'';
Whereas, on November 15, 2017, former Secretaries of Defense Leon Panetta, Ash 
        Carter, and Chuck Hagel warned: ``Increase in the debt will, in the 
        absence of a comprehensive budget that addresses both entitlements and 
        revenues, force even deeper reductions in our national security 
        capabilities''; and
Whereas, on September 22, 2011, former Chairman of the Joint Chiefs of Staff 
        Michael Mullen warned: ``I believe the single, biggest threat to our 
        national security is debt'': Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) recognizes that the national debt is a threat to the 
        national security of the United States;
            (2) realizes that deficits are unsustainable, 
        irresponsible, and dangerous;
            (3) commits to restoring regular order in the 
        appropriations process; and
            (4) commits to addressing the fiscal crisis faced by the 
        United States.
                                 <all>

Share This