There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Calling for a formal end of the Korean war.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/26/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/26/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/27/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/27/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/06/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 03/25/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/25/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/25/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/07/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/07/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 05/14/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/15/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/15/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/21/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/04/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 06/11/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/14/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/11/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 08/02/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 08/23/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/01/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/11/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 10/16/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 11/12/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 05/22/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 06/22/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/22/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/06/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/24/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 08/18/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 10/09/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/23/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 10/23/2020
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 10/30/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs02/26/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs02/26/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.152.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.152. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/26/2019)

This resolution pays tribute to the veterans and victims of the Korean War and the families divided by the war. It states that the House of Representatives would welcome a statement by the President declaring the end of the state of war with North Korea, and affirms that such a declaration would not affect U.S. commitments under the mutual defense treaty between the United States and South Korea.