There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the self-determination of Gibraltar to determine its status as a British Overseas Territory.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment.
03/05/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/05/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 03/06/2019
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/07/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/07/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/07/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 03/07/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/07/2019
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 03/07/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 03/07/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 03/13/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/13/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/18/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/07/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/21/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/24/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 05/24/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 07/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/05/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment03/25/2019 Referred to

As of 08/21/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.174 - Recognizing the self-determination of Gibraltar to determine its status as a British Overseas Territory.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.