There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that Congress should continue to support the F-35 Joint Strike Fighter Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/06/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Tactical Air and Land Forces.
03/05/2019Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
03/05/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 03/05/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/07/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 03/07/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 03/11/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 03/13/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services03/05/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Tactical Air and Land Forces03/06/2019 Referred to

As of 05/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.177 - Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that Congress should continue to support the F-35 Joint Strike Fighter Program..


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.