There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the United States condemns all forms of violence against children globally and recognizes the harmful impacts of violence against children.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
03/03/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
03/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
03/03/2020-12:58pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/03/2020-12:58pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1454)
03/03/2020-12:48pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 230.
03/03/2020-12:48pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1454-1456)
03/03/2020-12:48pmMr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
10/30/2019Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
10/30/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/14/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 03/18/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/25/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/25/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/03/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/03/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 04/08/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 04/08/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/09/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/09/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 04/12/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/25/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/29/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/29/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/01/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/01/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/03/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/16/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 05/16/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 05/16/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 05/22/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 05/22/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 05/24/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/10/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 06/18/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/20/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 07/02/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/17/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 07/25/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 08/20/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 08/23/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 08/23/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 08/23/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 09/06/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 09/06/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/06/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 09/16/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 09/16/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/17/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/24/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/08/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 10/08/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 10/17/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 10/18/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/21/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/23/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/28/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/29/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/30/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/01/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 11/20/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 01/28/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 02/28/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/02/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor03/14/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs03/14/2019 Referred to
10/30/2019 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.230. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (03/14/2019)

This resolution condemns all forms of violence against children and urges the United States to implement a comprehensive strategy to combat child abuse globally.