There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for the designation of the week of March 25 through March 29, 2019, as "Public Schools Week".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/25/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/25/2019Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
03/25/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (83)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 03/25/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/25/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/25/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 03/25/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22]* 03/25/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/25/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/29/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/29/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 03/29/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 04/02/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 04/02/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 04/10/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 04/15/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/15/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform03/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.254. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/25/2019)

This resolution supports the designation of Public Schools Week.