There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Promoting awareness of motorcycle profiling and encouraging collaboration and communication with the motorcycle community and law enforcement officials to prevent instances of profiling.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
04/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
03/26/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/26/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2837-2838)
03/26/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (138)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/26/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/26/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/26/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/28/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/28/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 03/28/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/02/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/10/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 04/10/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/10/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 04/12/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/12/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/29/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/02/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 05/07/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/07/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/07/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/09/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 05/09/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 05/09/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/09/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 05/21/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 05/21/2019
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/21/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 05/23/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/24/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/24/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 05/28/2019
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 05/30/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 05/30/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 06/03/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 06/03/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 06/04/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 06/06/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 06/06/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/06/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/11/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/11/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/11/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 06/12/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 06/12/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 06/13/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 06/18/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 06/20/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 06/20/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/21/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/26/2019
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 06/27/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 07/09/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/10/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/12/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/12/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 07/15/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 07/17/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/24/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 07/24/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/24/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 07/24/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/24/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/25/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 08/16/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 08/16/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 08/20/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/20/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 08/27/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/09/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/09/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 09/09/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/09/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 09/09/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/09/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/09/2019
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 09/09/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 09/09/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/09/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 09/09/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 09/10/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 09/10/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 09/10/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/10/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 09/17/2019
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 09/17/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/20/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 09/20/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 09/20/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/27/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/04/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 10/11/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/11/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 10/11/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/11/2019
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/11/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/16/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 10/16/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 10/16/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/16/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 10/18/2019
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 10/22/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 10/22/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/23/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/23/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/23/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/23/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/23/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 10/28/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 10/28/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 10/28/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 10/28/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 10/29/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/31/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 10/31/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/12/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 11/13/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 11/14/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/05/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 12/05/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 12/11/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 12/17/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 12/17/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 01/07/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 01/07/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 01/24/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 01/24/2020
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 01/24/2020
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 01/24/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/24/2020
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/28/2020
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/28/2020
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 01/29/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/12/2020
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/25/2020
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/25/2020
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/16/2020
Rep. Tiffany, Thomas P. [R-WI-7] 07/16/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/26/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security04/08/2019 Referred to

As of 10/01/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.255 - Promoting awareness of motorcycle profiling and encouraging collaboration and communication with the motorcycle community and law enforcement officials to prevent instances of profiling.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.255. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/26/2019)

This resolution promotes increased public awareness of motorcycle profiling.

The resolution also encourages the motorcycle community and law enforcement to collaborate and communicate on efforts to end motorcycle profiling.